Global Patent Index - EP 2026781 A2

EP 2026781 A2 2009-02-25 - PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION BASED ON MYRTUCOMMULONE A FOR THE SELECTIVE TUMOUR AND CANCER THERAPY

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION BASED ON MYRTUCOMMULONE A FOR THE SELECTIVE TUMOUR AND CANCER THERAPY

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNG AUF DER BASIS VON MYRTUCOMMULON A ZUR SELEKTIVEN TUMOR- UND KREBSTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

PRÉPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE À BASE DE MYRTUCOMMULON A POUR THÉRAPIE SÉLECTIVE TUMORALE ET CANCÉREUSE

Publication

EP 2026781 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07724913 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003989 W
  • DE 102006021154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128537A2] The invention relates to the use of myrtucommulone A as a lipophilic extract from myrtle or in a synthetically produced form or the use of a pharmaceutical composition that comprises the thus obtained myrtucommulone A for producing a medicament that influences cell growth, especially for the selective inhibition of an atypical cell proliferation, for example in the case of cancer. The lipophilic extract is preferably obtained from myrtle leaves, especially in a purified form. The purification is achieved by the fact that the lipophilic extract of myrtucommulone A is processed and concentrated in several steps. After at least a part of the processing steps, the lipophilic extract is absorbed by a solvent, optionally filtered and again extracted. Myrtucommulone A is subsequently obtained essentially as a pure substance in a chromatographic separation process.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/122 (2006.01); A61K 36/61 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 36/61 (2013.01); A61K 31/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128537A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006021154 A1 20071108; EP 2026781 A2 20090225; WO 2007128537 A2 20071115; WO 2007128537 A3 20080612

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110705

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERZ, OLIVER

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TRETIAKOVA, IRINA

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS