Global Patent Index - EP 2026785 A1

EP 2026785 A1 2009-02-25 - PROPELLANT-FREE INHALATION AEROSOL FORMULATION CONTAINING IPRATROPIUM BROMIDE AND SALBUTAMOL SULFATE

Title (en)

PROPELLANT-FREE INHALATION AEROSOL FORMULATION CONTAINING IPRATROPIUM BROMIDE AND SALBUTAMOL SULFATE

Title (de)

TREIBGASFREIE AEROSOLFORMULIERUNG FÜR DIE INHALATION ENTHALTEND IPRATROPIUMBROMID UND SALBUTAMOLSULFAT

Title (fr)

FORMULATION D'AÉROSOL SANS GAZ PROPULSEUR DESTINÉE À ÊTRE INHALÉE, CONTENANT DU BROMURE D'IPRATROPIUM ET DU SULFATE DE SALBUTAMOL

Publication

EP 2026785 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728942 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054490 W
  • EP 06114260 A
  • EP 06118115 A
  • EP 07728942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134967A1] The invention relates to propellant-free inhalation aerosol formulations that contain ipratropium bromide and salbutamol.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/46 (2013.01); A61K 9/007 (2013.01); A61K 9/0073 (2013.01); A61K 9/0078 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/183 (2013.01); A61K 47/186 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/137 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/46 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134967A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134967 A1 20071129; CA 2652699 A1 20071129; CA 2652699 C 20141104; EP 2026785 A1 20090225; JP 2009537475 A 20091029; JP 5317961 B2 20131016; US 2010056559 A1 20100304; US 2014228397 A1 20140814; US 2015306087 A1 20151029; US 9238031 B2 20160119

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151218

2015-12-18 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-02-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120123

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS