Global Patent Index - EP 2026814 A2

EP 2026814 A2 2009-02-25 - MIRTAZAPINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN

Title (en)

MIRTAZAPINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN

Title (de)

MIRTAZAPIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROPATHISCHEN SCHMERZEN

Title (fr)

MIRTAZAPINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR NEUROPATHIQUE

Publication

EP 2026814 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07729316 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054872 W
  • EP 06114316 A
  • EP 07729316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135123A2] This invention relates to a method of treatment of neuropathic pain comprising administering to a subject in need of treatment for neuropathic pain a therapeutically effective dose of S(+)-mirtazapine and the use of S(+)-mirtazapine for the manufacture of a medicine for the treatment of neuropathic pain and a pharmaceutical composition for the treatment of neuropathic pain, comprising S(+)-mirtazapine.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135123A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135123 A2 20071129; WO 2007135123 A3 20080313; AR 061046 A1 20080730; CA 2651607 A1 20071129; EP 2026814 A2 20090225; JP 2009537601 A 20091029; MX 2008014287 A 20081118; PE 04552008 A1 20080625; TW 200808804 A 20080216

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120522

2012-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MSD OSS B.V.

2011-12-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111111

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR