Global Patent Index - EP 2026837 A2

EP 2026837 A2 2009-02-25 - ANTIBODIES AS T CELL RECEPTOR MIMICS, METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

ANTIBODIES AS T CELL RECEPTOR MIMICS, METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ANTIKÖRPER ALS T-ZELL-REZEPTOR-MIMICS, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS UTILES EN TANT QU'ANALOGUES DE RÉCEPTEUR DES LYMPHOCYTES T, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 2026837 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07777355 A

Priority

  • US 2007012958 W
  • US 81007906 P
  • US 51751606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007143104A2] The present invention relates to a methodology of producing antibodies that recognize peptides associated with a tumorigenic or disease state, wherein the peptides are displayed in the context of HLA molecules. These antibodies will mimic the specificity of a T cell receptor (TCR) but will have higher binding affinity such that the molecules may be used as therapeutic, diagnostic and research reagents. The method of producing a T-cell receptor mimic of the present invention includes identifying a peptide of interest, wherein the peptide of interest is capable of being presented by an MHC molecule. Then, an immunogen comprising at least one peptide/MHC complex is formed, wherein the peptide of the peptide/MHG complex is the peptide of interest. An effective amount of the immunogen is then administered to a host for eliciting an immune response, and serum collected from the host is assayed to determine if desired antibodies that recognize a three-dimensional presentation of the peptide in the binding groove of the MHC molecule are being produced. The desired antibodies can differentiate the peptide/MHC complex from the MHC molecule alone, the peptide alone, and a complex of MHC and irrelevant peptide. Finally, the desired antibodies are isolated.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/74 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/26 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/32 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12P 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/18 (2013.01); C07K 16/26 (2013.01); C07K 16/2803 (2013.01); C07K 16/2833 (2013.01); C07K 16/2896 (2013.01); C07K 16/30 (2013.01); C07K 16/3015 (2013.01); C07K 16/3053 (2013.01); C07K 16/3069 (2013.01); C07K 16/32 (2013.01); C07K 16/40 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/32 (2013.01); C07K 2317/34 (2013.01); C07K 2317/732 (2013.01); C07K 2317/734 (2013.01); C07K 2317/92 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007143104 A2 20071213; WO 2007143104 A8 20080731; AU 2007254859 A1 20071213; CA 2656583 A1 20071213; EP 2026837 A2 20090225; EP 2026837 A4 20100602; IL 195470 D0 20110801

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140103

2011-12-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111115

2010-06-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100507

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 39/00 20060101AFI20080225BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07H 21/04 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 21/06 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/74 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/18 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/26 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/28 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/30 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/32 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/40 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEIDANZ, JON, A.

2009-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECEPTOR LOGIC INC.

2009-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS