Global Patent Index - EP 2026873 A1

EP 2026873 A1 2009-02-25 - NOVEL MANUFACTURINGS METHOD FOR SPINAL CORD STIMULATION LEAD

Title (en)

NOVEL MANUFACTURINGS METHOD FOR SPINAL CORD STIMULATION LEAD

Title (de)

NEUES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRODE ZUR RÜCKENMARKSTIMULATION

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DERIVATION DE STIMULATION DE MOELLE EPINIERE

Publication

EP 2026873 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07756404 A

Priority

  • US 2007060907 W
  • US 41358106 A
  • US 41358206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007127509A1] A medical electrical lead for spinal cord stimulation includes a first column of electrode surfaces and a second columns of electrode surfaces, which extends alongside and is spaced apart from the first column. The first and second columns of electrode surfaces are coupled to an insulative distal portion, which includes a concave surface extending from an inner edge of each of the electrode surfaces of the first column to an inner edge of each of the electrode surfaces of the second column.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/05 (2006.01); A61N 1/36 (2006.01); A61N 1/375 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/0551 (2013.01); A61N 1/0553 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007127510A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007127509 A1 20071108; EP 2024008 A1 20090218; EP 2024008 B1 20150826; EP 2026873 A1 20090225; WO 2007127510 A1 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOATWRIGHT, MARY, L.

2012-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOWER, JESSICA, L.

2012-09-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: METZLER, MICHAEL, E.

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/05 20060101AFI20120810BHEP

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/36 20060101ALI20120810BHEP

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/375 20060101ALI20120810BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090710

2009-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: METZLER, MICHAEL, E.

2009-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOWER, JESSICA, L.

2009-08-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOATWRIGHT, MARY, L.

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: METZLER, MICHAEL, E.

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOWER, JESSICA, L.

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOATWRIGHT, MARY, L.

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS