Global Patent Index - EP 2026909 A1

EP 2026909 A1 2009-02-25 - CENTRIFUGE, IN PARTICULAR SEPARATOR, HAVING A FEED LINE FOR CONTROL FLUID

Title (en)

CENTRIFUGE, IN PARTICULAR SEPARATOR, HAVING A FEED LINE FOR CONTROL FLUID

Title (de)

ZENTRIFUGE, INSBESONDERE SEPARATOR, MIT EINER ZULEITUNG FÜR STEUERFLUID

Title (fr)

CENTRIFUGEUSE, NOTAMMENT SÉPARATEUR, AVEC UNE CONDUITE D'AMENÉE POUR DU FLUIDE DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 2026909 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07730080 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055751 W
  • DE 202006009331 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE202006009331U1] A centrifuge (especially a separator) with a drum (2) rotating on a vertical axis via a rotating drive screw (5) has a control fluid feed (14) which is in a hydraulic system in the drum and which discharges radially before the drive screw (5) in an exit zone (6) arranged such that the exiting control fluid is injectable directly against screw (5) and a part of it enters the gap (7) between screw (5) and drum (2) or a torque-proof part (8) in the hydraulic system (9) within the drum.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/04 (2006.01); B04B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006009331 U1 20060810; CN 101356010 A 20090128; CN 101356010 B 20120704; EP 2026909 A1 20090225; JP 2009539594 A 20091119; JP 5061402 B2 20121031; US 2009270238 A1 20091029; US 8123667 B2 20120228; WO 2007144339 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180717

2016-10-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160926

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEA MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT GMBH

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080225

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS