Global Patent Index - EP 2026915 A1

EP 2026915 A1 2009-02-25 - ROLLING STAND FOR PRODUCING ROLLED STRIP OR SHEET

Title (en)

ROLLING STAND FOR PRODUCING ROLLED STRIP OR SHEET

Title (de)

WALZGERÜST ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WALZBAND ODER BLECH

Title (fr)

CAGE DE LAMINOIR POUR LA FABRICATION DE BANDE LAMINÉE OU DE TÔLE

Publication

EP 2026915 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725994 A

Priority

  • EP 2007005217 W
  • AT 10212006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144161A1] In a rolling stand for producing rolled strip or sheet using work rolls which are supported on backing rolls or intermediate rolls and backing rolls, wherein at least one of these rolls has a barrel contour (7) which runs over the entire effective barrel length and can be described by a non-linear function, and the barrel contour of this at least one roll has bevels in at least one of the marginal regions of its longitudinal extent and forms a corrected barrel contour in these marginal regions, inhomogeneity in the load distribution along the contact line of two adjacent rolls and in particular in the strip edge region is to be minimized. For this purpose, it is proposed that the corrected barrel contour be obtained by subtraction of any desired non-linear mathematical bevel function from the contour function described by the non-linear function, wherein the slope t of the barrel contour and the slope t of the corrected barrel contour at the transition point P from the barrel contour to the corrected barrel contour are identical.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/142 (2013.01); B21B 27/021 (2013.01); B21B 2013/025 (2013.01); B21B 2013/028 (2013.01); B21B 2027/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144161A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144161 A1 20071221; AT 488309 T 20101215; BR PI0713145 A2 20120320; BR PI0713147 A2 20120320; CN 101466483 A 20090624; CN 101466483 B 20110615; CN 101511498 A 20090819; CN 101511498 B 20110615; DE 502007005682 D1 20101230; EP 2026915 A1 20090225; EP 2026915 B1 20101117; EP 2026915 B2 20170927; EP 2026916 A1 20090225; EP 2026916 B1 20120801; ES 2355948 T3 20110401; ES 2355948 T5 20180214; ES 2392357 T3 20121210; RU 2009100918 A 20100720; RU 2009100920 A 20100720; RU 2428268 C2 20110910; RU 2442669 C2 20120220; SI 2026915 T1 20110331; SI 2026915 T2 20180131; SI 2026916 T1 20121130; UA 92946 C2 20101227; UA 93090 C2 20110110; US 2009314047 A1 20091224; US 2010031724 A1 20100211; US 8413476 B2 20130409; US 8881569 B2 20141111; WO 2007144162 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-14 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2355948 T5

- Effective date: 20180214

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20170927

2017-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-09-27 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502007005682

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Document: AT 488309 T

- Effective date: 20170314

2017-04-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: WIDDER, MARKUS

2017-04-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SEILINGER, ALOIS

2016-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 502007005682

2016-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007005682

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007005682

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SMS GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20110817

2016-05-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH; AT

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-05-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20160413

2015-06-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH

2015-06-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-02-27 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-01-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-01-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-26 [REG LT MM4D] LAPSE EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130613

2013-10-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-08-30 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-07-31 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-12-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-11-10 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007005682

- Effective date: 20110817

2011-09-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS SIEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20110817

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-08-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-06-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110217

2011-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-04-29 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2355948 T3

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-09 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2010-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007005682 P 20101230

2010-12-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS