Global Patent Index - EP 2026922 A1

EP 2026922 A1 2009-02-25 - HEATING DEVICE FOR PREHEATING A LIQUID-METAL TRANSFER CONTAINER

Title (en)

HEATING DEVICE FOR PREHEATING A LIQUID-METAL TRANSFER CONTAINER

Title (de)

HEIZEINRICHTUNG ZUM VORWÄRMEN EINES FLÜSSIGMETALL-TRANSPORTBEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE POUR LE PRÉCHAUFFAGE D'UN RÉCIPIENT DE TRANSPORT DE MÉTAUX EN FUSION

Publication

EP 2026922 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725115 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004195 W
  • DE 102006022689 A
  • DE 102007022684 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131721A1] A heating device for preheating a container (3), such as a transfer ladle, transferring liquid metal in melting operations, which is lined with refractory material, wherein the container is heated in a heating stand (1) having a container closure lid (2), is characterized by the use of porous burners (7) for heating the container (3) and keeping it warm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/015 (2006.01); F23D 14/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/16 (2013.01); B22D 41/015 (2013.01); F23D 91/02 (2015.07); F23D 2203/101 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1012 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1017 (2013.01); F23D 2203/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131721 A1 20071122; CA 2652034 A1 20071122; CA 2652034 C 20110118; CN 101443145 A 20090527; CN 101443145 B 20120808; DE 102007022684 A1 20071129; EP 2026922 A1 20090225; JP 2009537776 A 20091029; JP 4959786 B2 20120627; KR 101077517 B1 20111027; KR 20090007361 A 20090116; RU 2008149523 A 20100627; RU 2433886 C2 20111120; US 2010314809 A1 20101216; US 8357327 B2 20130122

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130703

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091027

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS