Global Patent Index - EP 2026925 A1

EP 2026925 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR METAL FOAMING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR METAL FOAMING

Title (de)

METALLSCHÄUMVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE MOUSSAGE MÉTALLIQUE

Publication

EP 2026925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725032 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004110 W
  • DE 102006024945 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137681A1] The invention relates to a method for metal foaming, in particular for producing a metal foam body, wherein a mixture of recycling material (for example chips) of at least one metallic component and at least one foaming agent is foamed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 8/00 (2013.01); B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); Y02P 10/24 (2015.11); Y02W 30/541 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024945 A1 20071206; EP 2026925 A1 20090225; WO 2007137681 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091117

2009-07-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOHLFELD, JOERG

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIPKE, THOMAS

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAEFFLER, PETER

2009-03-18 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS