Global Patent Index - EP 2026968 A2

EP 2026968 A2 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COATED PANELS AND COATED PANEL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COATED PANELS AND COATED PANEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTETEN PLATTEN UND BESCHICHTETE PLATTE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PANNEAUX ENDUITS, ET PANNEAUX ENDUITS

Publication

EP 2026968 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07734774 A

Priority

  • IB 2007001493 W
  • BE 200600325 A
  • US 87841607 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144718A2] Method for manufacturing coated panels of the type having a top layer (1), which comprises at least one carrier sheet (3) soaked in resin (2) and a printed decor (6) or a coloration, wherein hard nano- or micro- particles (9) are incorporated into the top layer (1), which are situated above said printed decor (6) or coloration, wherein the method comprises at least the step of forming a carrier sheet (3), which is provided with a resin coating, such that this at least partially resin-treated or resin-pre-treated carrier sheet (3) has an amount of resin (2) at least at the side intended to form the upper side (7) thereof, characterized in that the method also comprises the step of providing a suspension, which comprises at least a portion of said hard nano- or micro-particles (9), at the upper side (7) of said already resin-pre-treated carrier sheet (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 29/06 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D21H 27/26 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01); E04F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 29/06 (2013.01); B44C 5/04 (2013.01); D21H 27/28 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01); E04F 15/10 (2013.01); D21H 13/10 (2013.01); D21H 21/52 (2013.01); E04F 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144718A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144718 A2 20071221; WO 2007144718 A3 20080313; EP 2026968 A2 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-14 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151202

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090409

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS