Global Patent Index - EP 2026992 A1

EP 2026992 A1 2009-02-25 - HORSE TRAILER COMPRISING WATER TROUGHS

Title (en)

HORSE TRAILER COMPRISING WATER TROUGHS

Title (de)

PFERDEANHÄNGER MIT WASSERTRÄNKE

Title (fr)

REMORQUE A CHEVAUX EQUIPEE DE RESERVOIRS D'EAU

Publication

EP 2026992 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07764572 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004982 W
  • DE 102006027467 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144094A1] The invention relates to a horse trailer (1) comprising a box (4) mounted on an undercarriage and comprising a floor (5), a front wall (6), two lateral walls (7, 8), a rear closable loading opening (9), and a saddle compartment (13) arranged in a lower front region of the box (4) and protruding into the box (4). Said saddle compartment comprises a covering surface (13) which separates the saddle compartment on the top thereof from the inside of the cabin. A self-service water trough (20) is arranged in or on the upper side of the covering surface (15) of the saddle compartment, which faces the inside of the cabin.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60P 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60P 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144094A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027467 A1 20071213; EP 2026992 A1 20090225; WO 2007144094 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170117

2016-10-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160906

2013-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRIMERO TRAILER GMBH & CO. KG

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEGELSTEIN, FRIEDRICH

2012-08-08 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20081211

- Countries: HR

2012-08-08 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20081211

- Countries: RS

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS