Global Patent Index - EP 2027018 A2

EP 2027018 A2 2009-02-25 - DEVICE FOR DOSING PREDETERMINED PORTIONS OF A PASTY PRODUCT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DOSING PREDETERMINED PORTIONS OF A PASTY PRODUCT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIEREN VORBESTIMMTER MENGEN EINES PASTENARTIGEN PRODUKTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE PARTIES PRÉDÉTERMINÉES D'UN PRODUIT PÂTEUX

Publication

EP 2027018 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07734486 A

Priority

  • IB 2007001170 W
  • IT BO20060430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138397A2] A device (10) for dosing predetermined portions of a pasty product to be packaged, in particular a foodstuff such as processed cheese, a stock cube and other products, comprises a product dosing chamber (12) having a product infeed opening (14) and a product outfeed opening (16) and means for propelling or dispensing a predetermined portion of product from the outfeed opening (16). The propulsion or dispensing means comprise a product screw feeder (18).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/08 (2006.01); B65B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/08 (2013.01); B65B 3/28 (2013.01); B65B 39/004 (2013.01); B65B 2210/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138397A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007138397 A2 20071206; WO 2007138397 A3 20080717; EP 2027018 A2 20090225; IT BO20060430 A1 20071201

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110218

2010-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VIGNOLI, TERENZIO

2010-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100304

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS