Global Patent Index - EP 2027025 A2

EP 2027025 A2 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING FRUIT AND VEGETABLE PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING FRUIT AND VEGETABLE PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERPACKEN VON OBST- UND GEMÜSEPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR EMBALLER DES PRODUITS DE TYPE FRUITS ET LÉGUMES

Publication

EP 2027025 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07805032 A

Priority

  • IB 2007052000 W
  • IT BO20060454 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144799A2] The method for packaging fruit and vegetable products in crate-type containers (20), equipped with alveoli (21) suited to receive respective products (2), provides for feeding the products (2) along a plurality of conveying lines (30) arranged side by side and for intercepting these products (2) to allow the controlled transfer of individual products (2) to a station of visual observation (7), in which the same products (2) are rotated on revolving support means (6). Visual detection means (12) detect a predetermined surface portion of the products (2) and operate the collection means (13) suited to transfer the products (2) in orientated configuration inside respective alveoli (21) of the container (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/58 (2006.01); B65B 25/04 (2006.01); B65B 35/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/046 (2013.01); B65B 35/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144799A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144799 A2 20071221; WO 2007144799 A3 20080313; EP 2027025 A2 20090225; IT BO20060454 A1 20071214

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-11 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20130326

2011-10-26 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2010-12-22 [18RA] RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-05-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS