Global Patent Index - EP 2027034 A1

EP 2027034 A1 2009-02-25 - LID FOR CONTAINERS OF OIL AND SIMILAR PRODUCTS

Title (en)

LID FOR CONTAINERS OF OIL AND SIMILAR PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS FÜR ÖLBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE POUR CONTENANTS D'HUILE ET PRODUITS SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 2027034 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07725865 A

Priority

  • EP 2007005007 W
  • ES 200601515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141001A1] Said cap is constituted of two half-casings, one upper (1) and one lower (2), so that the lower half-casing (2) fixes to the mouth of the container by the inner peripheral skirt (3), and contains a seal in the shape of an inclined plane (4), joined by a rib (5), that allows the seal (4) to partially open, wherein in the upper part of the seal, a vertical stub (5a) is incorporated, which emerges from the inclined plane (4) and enables the seal (4) to return to its original position. The principal advantage of this invention is a notable saving of the product due to the control of consumption, acting as a proportional dispenser of the product according to every need and enabling the seal to be broken via simple rotation, avoiding the use of additional, separate and contaminating items.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141001A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES GR IT PT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141001 A1 20071213; AR 061154 A1 20080806; EP 2027034 A1 20090225; EP 2027034 B1 20090916; ES 2318967 A1 20090501; ES 2318967 B1 20100205

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120105

2012-03-14 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090403137

- Effective date: 20120105

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 4

2010-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090916

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091227

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100118

2010-01-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090403137

2009-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GR IT PT

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE ES GR IT PT

2009-06-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS