Global Patent Index - EP 2027065 A2

EP 2027065 A2 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHLORINE FROM HYDROGEN CHLORIDE AND OXYGEN

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHLORINE FROM HYDROGEN CHLORIDE AND OXYGEN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLOR AUS CHLORWASSERSTOFF UND SAUERSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CHLORE À PARTIR DE GAZ CHLORHYDRIQUE ET D'OXYGÈNE

Publication

EP 2027065 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07764547 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004613 W
  • DE 102006024516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134860A2] The invention relates to a method for producing chlorine by the thermal reaction of hydrogen chloride with oxygen using catalysts and/or by the non-thermally activated reaction of hydrogen chloride with oxygen, in which a) the gaseous mixture produced during the reaction, consisting at least of the target products chlorine and water, non-converted hydrogen chloride and oxygen, additional minor constituents such as carbon dioxide and nitrogen and optionally phosgene, is cooled to condense hydrochloric acid, b) the liquid hydrochloric acid thus produced is isolated from the gaseous mixture, c) the residual water in the gaseous mixture is removed, in particular by washing with concentrated sulphuric acid. The method is characterised in that d) oxygen and optionally also minor constituents, in particular CO<SUB>2</SUB> and/or N<SUB>2 </SUB>are eliminated from the resultant gaseous mixture by gas permeation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 7/04 (2013.01); C01B 7/0743 (2013.01); C01B 13/0251 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134860A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024516 A1 20071129; CN 101454240 A 20090610; EP 2027065 A2 20090225; JP 2009537452 A 20091029; KR 20090009895 A 20090123; RU 2008150596 A 20100627; TW 200804188 A 20080116; US 2007286793 A1 20071213; WO 2007134860 A2 20071129; WO 2007134860 A3 20080731

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEBER, RAINER

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BULAN, ANDREAS

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAAS, MICHEL

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WARSITZ, RAFAEL

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, KNUD

2009-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS