Global Patent Index - EP 2027072 A1

EP 2027072 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IRRIGATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IRRIGATION

Title (de)

BEWÄSSERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM

Title (fr)

MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME D'IRRIGATION

Publication

EP 2027072 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07777206 A

Priority

  • US 2007012145 W
  • US 80461006 P
  • US 80551206 P
  • US 52403306 A
  • US 52407806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007145785A1] An electrically-driven separation apparatus can be utilized to desalinate seawater and/or brackish water to provide irrigation water having a desired sodium adsorption ratio (SAR).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/469 (2006.01); A01G 25/00 (2006.01); B01D 61/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/469 (2013.01); A01G 25/00 (2013.01); B01D 61/44 (2013.01); C02F 1/02 (2013.01); C02F 1/42 (2013.01); C02F 1/4693 (2013.01); C02F 2103/08 (2013.01); C02F 2209/005 (2013.01); C02F 2209/05 (2013.01); Y02A 20/134 (2018.01); Y02A 40/241 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007145785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007145785 A1 20071221; AU 2007259267 A1 20071221; AU 2007259267 B2 20110922; AU 2007259354 A1 20071221; AU 2007259354 B2 20120419; BR PI0713414 A2 20120327; CA 2655050 A1 20071221; CL 2007001706 A1 20080118; CN 104478044 A 20150401; EA 017151 B1 20121030; EA 200970004 A1 20090630; EP 2027072 A1 20090225; EP 2035334 A1 20090318; IL 195497 A 20130930; IL 195497 D0 20090901; IL 195908 D0 20090901; IL 224102 A 20150630; JP 2009539402 A 20091119; KR 20090019010 A 20090224; MX 2008015813 A 20090112; SG 174796 A1 20111028; SG 174797 A1 20111028; TW 200806586 A 20080201; TW 200812473 A 20080316; TW I510439 B 20151201; WO 2007145786 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC

2014-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC

2014-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS WATER TECHNOLOGIES LLC

2014-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20131209

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS