Global Patent Index - EP 2027078 A1

EP 2027078 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POROUS CARBON MOLDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POROUS CARBON MOLDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PORÖSER KOHLENSTOFF-FORMKÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉS EN CARBONE POREUX

Publication

EP 2027078 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724720 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003793 W
  • EP 06011198 A
  • EP 07724720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137667A1] The present invention relates to a method based on phase separation for the production of porous carbon monoliths, the monoliths produced according to the invention and the use thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/00 (2006.01); C04B 35/52 (2006.01); C04B 35/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 38/0022 (2013.01); B01J 20/20 (2013.01); B01J 20/28042 (2013.01); B01J 20/28066 (2013.01); B01J 20/28092 (2013.01); B01J 20/282 (2013.01); B01J 20/3007 (2013.01); C04B 35/524 (2013.01); H01G 9/04 (2013.01); H01G 11/34 (2013.01); B01J 2220/82 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00793 (2013.01); C04B 2111/0081 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00853 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6021 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6562 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6567 (2013.01); Y02E 60/13 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249921 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249953 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

C04B 38/0022 + C04B 35/52 + C04B 38/0064 + C04B 38/0074

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137667A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137667 A1 20071206; CN 101454243 A 20090610; CN 101454243 B 20120418; CN 101454259 A 20090610; EP 2027078 A1 20090225; JP 2009538811 A 20091112; KR 20090032050 A 20090331; TW 200804180 A 20080116; US 2009176079 A1 20090709

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101022

2010-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100611

2009-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER WISSENS

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CABRERA PEREZ, KARIN

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ADELHELM, PHILIPP

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMARSLY, BERND

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANTONIETTI, MARKUS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CABRERA PEREZ, KARIN

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ADELHELM, PHILIPP

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMARSLY, BERND

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANTONIETTI, MARKUS

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS