Global Patent Index - EP 2027093 A2

EP 2027093 A2 2009-02-25 - SUBSTITUTED CYANOPYRIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED CYANOPYRIDINES AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE CYANOPYRIDINE ALS PROTEINKINASE-HEMMER

Title (fr)

CYANOPYRIDINES SUBSTITUÉES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE PROTÉINE KINASES

Publication

EP 2027093 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07796050 A

Priority

  • US 2007013851 W
  • US 81318206 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007146323A2] The present teachings provide compounds of formula I XR R2 XN and their pharmaceutically acceptable salts, hydrates, and esters, wherein R1, R2, and X are as defined herein. The present teachings also provide methods of making the compounds of formula I, and methods of treating autoimmune and inflammatory diseases by administering a therapeutically effective amount of a compound or compounds of formula I to a mammal including a human.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/85 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007146323A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007146323 A2 20071221; WO 2007146323 A3 20080417; AR 061367 A1 20080820; AU 2007258352 A1 20071221; BR PI0712776 A2 20131217; CA 2650666 A1 20071221; CL 2007001738 A1 20080118; CN 101454287 A 20090610; EP 2027093 A2 20090225; JP 2009539993 A 20091119; MX 2008015805 A 20090109; PE 03692008 A1 20080604; TW 200815356 A 20080401

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH LLC

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR