Global Patent Index - EP 2027099 A2

EP 2027099 A2 2009-02-25 - RACEMISATION OF ENANTIOMERS OF NEFOPAM AND ANALOGUES

Title (en)

RACEMISATION OF ENANTIOMERS OF NEFOPAM AND ANALOGUES

Title (de)

RACEMISIERUNG VON ENANTIOMEREN VON NEFOPAM UND ANALOGEN

Title (fr)

RACÉMISATION D'ÉNANTIOMÈRES DE NÉFOPAM ET ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 2027099 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07732871 A

Priority

  • GB 2007001849 W
  • GB 0609793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132255A2] A process for the racemisation of a compound which is nefopam or an analogue thereof in the form of a single enantiomer or non-racemic mixture, which comprising contacting the compound with an acid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 267/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 267/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132255A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007132255 A2 20071122; WO 2007132255 A3 20080124; AU 2007251332 A1 20071122; BR PI0711836 A2 20111213; CA 2652250 A1 20071122; CN 101448799 A 20090603; EP 2027099 A2 20090225; GB 0609793 D0 20060628; IL 195199 D0 20090803; JP 2009538281 A 20091105; KR 20090023603 A 20090305; MX 2008014432 A 20081218

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1121761

2010-11-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100608

2009-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-30 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1121761

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS