Global Patent Index - EP 2027106 A2

EP 2027106 A2 2009-02-25 - CGRP RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

CGRP RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

CGRP-REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR DU CGRP

Publication

EP 2027106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07796082 A

Priority

  • US 2007013896 W
  • US 81317806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007146349A2] The present invention relates to CGRP receptor antagonists, pharmaceutical compositions thereof, and methods therewith for treating CGRP receptor-mediated diseases and conditions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/14 (2013.01); C07D 277/14 (2013.01); C07D 417/06 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 471/10 (2013.01); C07D 498/10 (2013.01); C07D 513/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007146349A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007146349 A2 20071221; WO 2007146349 A3 20080925; AR 061362 A1 20080820; AU 2007258294 A1 20071221; CA 2655085 A1 20071221; CN 101501009 A 20090805; EP 2027106 A2 20090225; IL 195807 D0 20090901; JP 2009539997 A 20091119; JP 5382799 B2 20140108; MX 2008015906 A 20090306; NZ 574097 A 20120112; TW 200813019 A 20080316; ZA 200810791 B 20100331

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160105

2014-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED

2014-02-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

2014-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140115

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUTIERREZ, COREY

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TERMIN, ANDREAS

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HADIDA-RUAH, SARA

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOSHI, PRAMOD

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERGERON, DANIELE

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOO, SANGHEE

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BINCH, HAYLEY

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COME, JON

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NANTHAKUMAR, SUGANTHI

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAO, JINGRONG

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS