Global Patent Index - EP 2027171 A1

EP 2027171 A1 2009-02-25 - FORMALDEHYDE-FREE, CARBONYL- AND RING-HYDROGENATED KETONE-ALDEHYDE RESINS BASED ON ALKYL ARYL KETONES AND FORMALDEHYDE WHICH HAVE A LOW OH FUNCTIONALITY AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM

Title (en)

FORMALDEHYDE-FREE, CARBONYL- AND RING-HYDROGENATED KETONE-ALDEHYDE RESINS BASED ON ALKYL ARYL KETONES AND FORMALDEHYDE WHICH HAVE A LOW OH FUNCTIONALITY AND A PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM

Title (de)

FORMALDEHYDFREIE, CARBONYL- UND KERNHYDRIERTE KETON-ALDEHYDHARZE AUF BASIS VON ALKYLARYLKETONEN UND FORMALDEHYD MIT GERINGER OH-FUNKTIONALITÄT UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

RÉSINES ALDÉHYDE-CÉTONE À CARBONYLE ET COEUR HYDROGÉNÉ SANS FORMALDÉHYDE À BASE D'ALKYLARYLCÉTONES ET DE FORMALDÉHYDE AVEC UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ OH FAIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 2027171 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729095 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054643 W
  • DE 102006026758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141114A1] The invention relates to formaldehyde-free, carbonyl- and ring-hydrogenated ketone-aldehyde resins based on alkyl aryl ketones and formaldehyde which have a low OH functionality, a low proportion of compounds capable of crystallization, a low viscosity, a very low colour number and a very high heat and light stability and also a process for preparing them.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 6/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141114 A1 20071213; CN 101085824 A 20071212; DE 102006026758 A1 20080110; EP 2027171 A1 20090225; JP 2009540027 A 20091119; US 2009198024 A1 20090806

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130226

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS