Global Patent Index - EP 2027180 A1

EP 2027180 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYETHER POLYOLS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYETHER POLYOLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHERPOLYOLEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE POLYOLS DE POLYÉTHER

Publication

EP 2027180 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729399 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054960 W
  • EP 06114369 A
  • EP 07729399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135154A1] The invention proposes a method for producing polyether polyols by converting the following reactants: a) one or several alkylene oxides and, optionally, carbon dioxide, as well as b) one or several H-functional starting materials in the presence of a catalyst, having several micro-structured layers, A and B, arranged parallel to one other in a reaction unit such that each layer displays a multiplicity of channels arranged parallel to one another, which form a continuous flow path from one side of the plate to the opposite side of said plate, characterized by the fact that, a distribution device is proposed at the end of layer A for the channels of said layer to supply the reactants as well as the catalyst, and a collection device is proposed at the other end of said layer for the reaction mixture.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 65/2696 (2013.01); C08G 18/4866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135154A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135154 A1 20071129; CN 101479317 A 20090708; EP 2027180 A1 20090225; JP 2009537687 A 20091029; KR 20090014296 A 20090209; MX 2008014818 A 20081201; SG 147866 A1 20081231; US 2009203874 A1 20090813; US 8034980 B2 20111011

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-05-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140417

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090727

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS