Global Patent Index - EP 2027207 A1

EP 2027207 A1 2009-02-25 - RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING GOOD SCRATCH RESISTANCE

Title (en)

RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING GOOD SCRATCH RESISTANCE

Title (de)

HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GUTER KRATZFESTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE À BONNE RÉSISTANCE À LA RAYURE

Publication

EP 2027207 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07746342 A

Priority

  • KR 2007002187 W
  • KR 20060040708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007129835A1] One aspect of the invention relates to a resin composition having good scratch resistance. The resin composition comprises about 5 to about 50 parts by weight of core-shell graft resin (A) and about 95 to about 50 parts by weight of resin (B) which contains about 40 to about 100 % by weight of (meth)acrylic acid alkyl ester. The outer shell of the core-shell graft resin (A) comprises (meth) acrylic acid alkyl ester.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 33/04 (2013.01); C08F 285/00 (2013.01); C08L 51/003 (2013.01); C08L 51/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 285/00 + C08F 220/12
  2. C08L 33/04 + C08L 2666/24
  3. C08L 51/003 + C08L 2666/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007129835 A1 20071115; CN 101360787 A 20090204; CN 101360787 B 20111214; EP 2027207 A1 20090225; EP 2027207 A4 20090527; EP 2027207 B1 20120411; JP 2009535476 A 20091001; JP 5096460 B2 20121212; KR 100799605 B1 20080130; KR 20070108008 A 20071108; TW 200804496 A 20080116; TW I364440 B 20120521; US 2009043047 A1 20090212; US 8314182 B2 20121120

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LOTTE ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD., KR

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170504 AND 20170510

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOTTE ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD., YEOSU-SI, KR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., YONGIN-SI, KYONGGI-DO, KR

- Document: DE 602007021922

2017-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007021922

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

2017-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOTTE ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD., YEOSU-SI, KR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHEIL INDUSTRIES, INC., GUMI, GYEONGSANGBUK, KR

- Document: DE 602007021922

2017-04-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007021922

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

2017-03-15 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: LOTTE ADVANCED MATERIALS CO., LTD.; KR

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), MERGE; FORMER OWNER NAME: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20170221

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-05-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007021922

- Effective date: 20130114

2013-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130114

2012-07-18 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-06-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007021922

- Effective date: 20120606

2012-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2012-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-11-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090618

2009-05-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090429

2009-05-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS