Global Patent Index - EP 2027210 A1

EP 2027210 A1 2009-02-25 - SHOE SOLES DISPLAYING WATER ABSORBING PROPERTIES

Title (en)

SHOE SOLES DISPLAYING WATER ABSORBING PROPERTIES

Title (de)

SCHUHSOHLEN MIT WASSERABSORBIERENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

SEMELLES DE CHAUSSURE AVEC DES PROPRIÉTÉS ABSORBANT L'EAU

Publication

EP 2027210 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729230 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054782 W
  • EP 06114342 A
  • EP 07729230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135069A1] The present invention relates to a discontinuous method for producing a polyurethane foam consisting of a combination of (a) polyisocyanate having (b) at least one higher molecular bond with at least two reactive hydrogen atoms, (c) an optional low molecular chain extension and/or crosslinking product, (d) propellants containing water as an option, (e) catalysts, (f) a water absorbing polymer, (g) an optional latent heat storage device containing capsules, and (h) other optional additives, and the reaction mixture thus obtained is then converted into polyurethane foam, wherein said propellant (d) does not contain water or, if said propellant (d) does contain water, the propellant (d) and the water absorbing polymer (f) are first brought into contact when the reaction mixture is produced. In addition, the invention also relates to polyurethane foam obtained according to said method, as well as shoe soles containing said polyurethane foam.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 75/08 (2006.01); C08G 18/12 (2006.01); C08G 18/63 (2006.01); C08J 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/4072 (2013.01); A43B 13/04 (2013.01); C08G 18/12 (2013.01); C08G 18/632 (2013.01); C08L 75/04 (2013.01); C08L 75/08 (2013.01); C08G 2101/0008 (2013.01); C08G 2350/00 (2013.01); C08G 2410/00 (2013.01); C08L 33/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08G 18/12 + C08G 18/40
  2. C08L 75/04 + C08L 2666/04
  3. C08L 75/08 + C08L 2666/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135069 A1 20071129; CN 101454396 A 20090610; CN 101454396 B 20111012; EP 2027210 A1 20090225; JP 2009537683 A 20091029; KR 20090019817 A 20090225; US 2009234039 A1 20090917

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160622

2016-03-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160211

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100820

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS