Global Patent Index - EP 2027215 A1

EP 2027215 A1 2009-02-25 - COATING MATERIAL

Title (en)

COATING MATERIAL

Title (de)

BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT

Publication

EP 2027215 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722368 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000814 W
  • DE 102006023375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131474A1] The invention relates to a coating material with self-cleaning properties. In order to produce a coating material with which self-cleaning surfaces can also be made for internal areas and even in darkness, according to the invention it is proposed that the coating material contains hydrophilic surface components which are present in nano- or micro-structured form, or in a combined micro-/nano-structured form. Surprisingly, it has been shown in the context of the invention that the principles of the Lotus-Effect ® apply not only to hydrophobic but also to hydrophilic surfaces.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); C09D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 17/065 (2013.01); B08B 17/06 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C09D 1/00 (2013.01); C09D 5/00 (2013.01); C09D 7/63 (2018.01); C09D 7/67 (2018.01); C09D 7/68 (2018.01); C09D 7/69 (2018.01); C09D 7/70 (2018.01); B05D 7/542 (2013.01); C08K 3/22 (2013.01); C08K 5/05 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31612 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31663 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131474A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006023375 A1 20071122; EP 2027215 A1 20090225; JP 2009537639 A 20091029; US 2009263586 A1 20091022; WO 2007131474 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-29 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOEDICKE, STEFAN

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROSS, FRANK

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEPEUR, STEFAN

2009-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090716

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS