Global Patent Index - EP 2027229 A2

EP 2027229 A2 2009-02-25 - SILICONE-TACKIFIER MATRIXES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

SILICONE-TACKIFIER MATRIXES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

SILICONKLEBRIGMACHERMATRIZEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

MATRICES DE SILICONE-AGENT POISSEUX ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI

Publication

EP 2027229 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07733085 A

Priority

  • GB 2007002073 W
  • US 44745606 A
  • US 44745306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141519A2] A method comprising providing a treatment fluid that comprises a base fluid and a silicone-tackifier matrix composition that comprises at least one silicone polymer component, at least one tackifying agent, and at least one curing agent and/or at least one cross linking agent; placing the treatment fluid in a subterranean formation; and allowing the silicone-tackifier matrix to form at least one silicone-tackifier matrix therein.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 8/512 (2006.01); C09K 8/68 (2006.01); C09K 8/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 8/68 (2013.01); C09K 8/5086 (2013.01); C09K 8/512 (2013.01); C09K 8/685 (2013.01); C09K 8/76 (2013.01); C09K 8/805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141519A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141519 A2 20071213; WO 2007141519 A3 20080320; EP 2027229 A2 20090225; NO 20084468 A 20090209

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170103

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS