Global Patent Index - EP 2027231 A1

EP 2027231 A1 2009-02-25 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LUMINESCENT SUBSTANCES FOR FLARES IN A PULSATION REACTOR

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LUMINESCENT SUBSTANCES FOR FLARES IN A PULSATION REACTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRANAT-LEUCHTSTOFFEN IN EINEM PULSATIONSREAKTOR

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SUBSTANCES LUMINESCENTES GRENAT DANS UN RÉACTEUR PULSÉ

Publication

EP 2027231 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725395 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004488 W
  • DE 102006027133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144060A1] The invention relates to a process for the production of luminescent substances for flares or to their preliminary stages, using particles with a medium grain size of 50 nm to 20 µm in a multi-stage, thermal process within a pulsation reactor, as well as lighting units containing the luminescent substances for flares in accordance with the invention.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/80 (2006.01); C01B 13/34 (2006.01); C01F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 11/7721 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C01B 13/34 (2013.01); C01F 17/0025 (2013.01); C09K 11/7774 (2013.01); C01P 2002/84 (2013.01); C01P 2004/03 (2013.01); C01P 2004/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144060A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027133 A1 20071213; CA 2646894 A1 20071221; CN 101466814 A 20090624; EP 2027231 A1 20090225; JP 2009540069 A 20091119; KR 20090026338 A 20090312; TW 200808941 A 20080216; US 2009189507 A1 20090730; WO 2007144060 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINKLER, HOLGER

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KHALIL, TAREK

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCHER, GERD

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEIDOLPH, LARS

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081030

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS