Global Patent Index - EP 2027249 A1

EP 2027249 A1 2009-02-25 - DETECTING MULTIPLE TYPES OF LEUKOCYTES

Title (en)

DETECTING MULTIPLE TYPES OF LEUKOCYTES

Title (de)

NACHWEIS MEHRERER LEUKOZYTENTYPEN

Title (fr)

DÉTECTION DE PLUSIEURS TYPES DE LEUCOCYTES

Publication

EP 2027249 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07762108 A

Priority

  • US 2007068704 W
  • US 79956206 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134191A1] Methods, systems, and apparatus for detecting multiple types of leukocytes in a blood sample material. A fluid or gas sample may pass through a sieve-based detection system of a cartridge. Detection and analysis techniques may be applied to determine the relative distribution of multiple types of white blood cells in the sample.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/34 (2006.01); G01N 33/49 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/8483 (2013.01); B01L 3/502753 (2013.01); G01N 33/56972 (2013.01); B01L 3/502707 (2013.01); B01L 3/502715 (2013.01); B01L 2200/0647 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0681 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0816 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0861 (2013.01); B01L 2300/161 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0481 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0677 (2013.01); G01N 2333/70589 (2013.01); G01N 2333/70596 (2013.01); Y02A 50/58 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134191 A1 20071122; CA 2651872 A1 20071122; EP 2027249 A1 20090225; EP 2027249 A4 20110525

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-05-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110427

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12M 1/34 20060101AFI20080215BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/569 20060101ALI20110415BHEP

2011-05-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/49 20060101ALI20110415BHEP

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS