Global Patent Index - EP 2027251 A2

EP 2027251 A2 2009-02-25 - THERMAL CYCLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

THERMAL CYCLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

THERMISCHES WECHSELBEANSPRUCHUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CYCLAGE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 2027251 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783905 A

Priority

  • US 2007069197 W
  • US 87317206 P
  • US 87308406 P
  • US 80117806 P
  • US 83249206 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008070198A2] This invention provides a system for performing PCR, and real time PCR in particular, with great speed and specificity. The system employs a heat block containing a liquid composition to rapidly transfer heat to and from reaction vessels. The system makes use of the reflective properties of the liquid metal to reflect signal from the PCR into the vessel and out the top. In this way, the signal can be measured by an optical assembly in real time without removing the vessels from the heat block.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/645 (2013.01); B01L 3/508 (2013.01); B01L 7/52 (2013.01); B01L 7/02 (2013.01); B01L 7/525 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0809 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0832 (2013.01); B01L 2300/168 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1822 (2013.01); B01L 2300/1827 (2013.01); B01L 2300/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008070198 A2 20080612; WO 2008070198 A3 20090416; WO 2008070198 A8 20081224; EP 2027251 A2 20090225; EP 2027251 A4 20100505; EP 2535427 A2 20121219; EP 2535427 A3 20130424; JP 2009537152 A 20091029

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHERER, AXEL

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOODWIN, DAVID

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WALKER, CHRISTOPHER I.

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOHNSTON, MATTHEW

2013-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALTEZOS, GEORGE

2010-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100722

2010-05-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100406

2009-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/68 20060101AFI20090430BHEP

2009-06-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/10 20060101ALI20090430BHEP

2009-05-20 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS