Global Patent Index - EP 2027255 A2

EP 2027255 A2 2009-02-25 - DEVICE AND SUBSTANCE FOR ISOLATING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS (MSC)

Title (en)

DEVICE AND SUBSTANCE FOR ISOLATING MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS (MSC)

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND SUBSTANZ ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON MESENCHYMALEN STAMMZELLEN (MSC)

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET SUBSTANCE DESTINÉS À ISOLER DES CELLULES SOUCHES MÉSENCHYMATEUSES

Publication

EP 2027255 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07724981 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004057 W
  • DE 102006026191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006026191A1] Device with a surface coming into contact with a biological tissue or fluid has at least part of this surface coated with an aptamer that mediates binding of mesenchymal stem cells. Independent claims are also included for: (1) binding and/or isolating mesenchymal stem cells (MSC) by preparing an MSC-containing biological tissue or fluid, incubating the tissue or fluid with an MSC-binding aptamer and optionally isolating the aptamer-bound MSC; (2) nucleic acid molecule that binds selectively and highly specifically to MSC.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/0775 (2010.01); C12N 15/11 (2006.01); C12N 15/115 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/111 (2013.01); C12N 5/0663 (2013.01); C12N 15/115 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3517 (2013.01); C12N 2320/11 (2013.01); C12N 2320/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137679A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026191 A1 20071129; EP 2027255 A2 20090225; US 2009186356 A1 20090723; WO 2007137679 A2 20071206; WO 2007137679 A3 20080403

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WENDEL, HANS-PETER

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUO, KETAI

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, RICHARD

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS