Global Patent Index - EP 2027285 A1

EP 2027285 A1 2009-02-25 - SPECIES-INDEPENDENT DNA FINGERPRINT ANALYSIS WITH PRIMERS DERIVED FROM THE NotI IDENTIFICATION SEQUENCE

Title (en)

SPECIES-INDEPENDENT DNA FINGERPRINT ANALYSIS WITH PRIMERS DERIVED FROM THE NotI IDENTIFICATION SEQUENCE

Title (de)

SPEZIES-UNABHÄNGIGE DNA-FINGERPRINT-ANALYSE MIT PRIMER ABGELEITET VON DER NotI - ERKENNUNGSSEQUENZ

Title (fr)

ANALYSE DES EMPREINTES GÉNÉTIQUES INDÉPENDANTE DES ESPÈCES AVEC UNE AMORCE DÉRIVÉE DE LA SÉQUENCE DE RECONNAISSANCE NotI

Publication

EP 2027285 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725234 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004317 W
  • DE 102006022569 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131776A1] The invention relates to a species-independent detection procedure for prokaryotic and eukaryotic organisms. In addition, primers and kits for application in the fingerprint analysis of biological material are provided. The primers are derived from the identification sequence of the NotI restriction endonuclease.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/689 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6876 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131776A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022569 A1 20071122; DE 102006022569 B4 20110505; EP 2027285 A1 20090225; WO 2007131776 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-05-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130410

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS