Global Patent Index - EP 2027288 A1

EP 2027288 A1 2009-02-25 - REACTION CHAMBER FOR REAL TIME PCR COMPRISING CAPTURE PROBES AND PERMITTING DETECTION OF THE PCR PRODUCT BY HYBRIDISATION WITHOUT OPENING THE PCR VESSEL

Title (en)

REACTION CHAMBER FOR REAL TIME PCR COMPRISING CAPTURE PROBES AND PERMITTING DETECTION OF THE PCR PRODUCT BY HYBRIDISATION WITHOUT OPENING THE PCR VESSEL

Title (de)

REAKTIONSKAMMER FÜR ECHTZEIT-PCR MIT EINFANGSONDEN UND GESTATTEN DES NACHWEISES DES PCR-PRODUKTS MITTELS HYBRIDISIERUNG OHNE ÖFFNEN DES PCR-GEFÄSSES

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE DE RÉACTION DESTINÉE À UNE RCP EN TEMPS RÉEL COMPRENANT DES SONDES DE CAPTURE ET PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER LE PRODUIT RCP PAR HYBRIDATION, SANS OUVERTURE DU CONTENANT RCP

Publication

EP 2027288 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07729115 A

Priority

  • EP 07729115 A
  • EP 2007054663 W
  • EP 2005012382 W
  • EP 06114103 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1788095A1] A reaction chamber (1) for real-time PCR configured for containing a PCR solution (3), said chamber having a capture molecule (4) immobilized on the chamber inner surface, said surface being configured to be in intermittent contact with the PCR solution (3), and a window (7) permitting detection of a signal from said inner surface by a reader (6) located outside the chamber, and wherein the immobilized capture molecule (4) is not labeled.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50825 (2013.01); B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01L 3/502715 (2013.01); B01L 3/50851 (2013.01); B01L 3/50853 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00283 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00315 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00333 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00511 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00608 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0061 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00612 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00635 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00641 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00659 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00702 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00722 (2013.01); B01L 7/52 (2013.01); B01L 2300/046 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0636 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0654 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0803 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0409 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131995A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1788095 A1 20070523; EP 1788095 B1 20110413; CA 2652011 A1 20071122; CN 101506374 A 20090812; CN 101506374 B 20130327; DE 602006021269 D1 20110526; EP 1788096 A1 20070523; EP 1788098 A1 20070523; EP 2027288 A1 20090225; WO 2007131995 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130803

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100419

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REMACLE, JOSE

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALEXANDRE, ISABELLE

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOEHN, HEINZ

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEIPPEL, MARTIN

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REMACLE, JOSE

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALEXANDRE, ISABELLE

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOEHN, HEINZ

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEIPPEL, MARTIN

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS