Global Patent Index - EP 2027297 A1

EP 2027297 A1 2009-02-25 - TREATMENT OF LEATHER WITH KETOCARBONYL-FUNCTIONAL SILOXANE POLYMERS

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF LEATHER WITH KETOCARBONYL-FUNCTIONAL SILOXANE POLYMERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON LEDER MIT KETOCARBONYL-FUNKTIONELLEN SILOXANPOLYMEREN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CUIR AVEC DES POLYMÈRES DE SILOXANE À FONCTION CÉTOCARBONYLE

Publication

EP 2027297 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729419 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054981 W
  • DE 102006027400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144249A1] Process for treatment of proteinaceous, fibrous entitites, in particular leather, wool or wool articles, with compositions comprising ß-ketocarbonyl-functional siloxane polymers containing at least one tervalent radical B of the general formula (I), where R<SUP>3</SUP> is a hydrogen atom or a univalent hydrocarbyl radical with 1 to 30 carbon atoms, preferably a hydrogen atom.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 9/02 (2006.01); D06M 15/643 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 9/02 (2013.01); D06M 15/643 (2013.01); D06M 2101/12 (2013.01); D06M 2200/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144249A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027400 A1 20071220; CN 101466849 A 20090624; CN 101466849 B 20121128; DE 502007003754 D1 20100624; EP 2027297 A1 20090225; EP 2027297 B1 20100512; JP 2009540143 A 20091119; JP 4909407 B2 20120404; KR 101121910 B1 20120320; KR 20090017669 A 20090218; US 2009144912 A1 20090611; WO 2007144249 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141201

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 7

2011-06-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007003754

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110215

2010-06-30 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003754 P 20100624

2010-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2010-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-01-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TREATMENT OF LEATHER WITH KETOCARBONYL-FUNCTIONAL SILOXANE POLYMERS

2009-11-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TREATMENT OF LEATHER WITH KETOCARBONYL-FUNCTIONAL SILOXANE POLYMERS& XA;

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090327

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS