Global Patent Index - EP 2027300 A2

EP 2027300 A2 2009-02-25 - STEEL COMPOSITIONS FOR SPECIAL USES

Title (en)

STEEL COMPOSITIONS FOR SPECIAL USES

Title (de)

STAHLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR SPEZIELLE ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ACIERS POUR USAGES SPECIAUX

Publication

EP 2027300 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07788846 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000941 W
  • FR 0605133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141427A2] The invention concerns steels having excellent resistance over time, in a corrosive atmosphere due to oxidizing environments such as, for example, fumes or water vapour, under high pressure and/or temperature. The invention concerns a steel composition for special applications, said composition containing, by weight, about 1.8 to 11% of chromium (and preferably between about 2.3 and 10% of chromium), less than 1% of silicon, and between 0.20 and 0.45% of manganese. It has been found that it is possible to adjust the contents of the composition based on a predetermined model, selected to obtain substantially optimal properties with respect to corrosion in specific conditions of high temperature performances. Said model can involve as additive of as residue at least one element selected among molybdenum, tungsten, cobalt, and nickel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); Y10S 148/909 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141427A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141427 A2 20071213; WO 2007141427 A3 20080731; AT 520796 T 20110915; AU 2007255279 A1 20071213; AU 2007255279 B2 20111013; BR PI0712148 A2 20120222; CA 2654521 A1 20071213; CA 2654521 C 20141014; CN 101466859 A 20090624; CN 101466859 B 20120822; EA 015633 B1 20111031; EA 200870608 A1 20090428; EP 2027300 A2 20090225; EP 2027300 B1 20110817; EP 2027300 B8 20121114; ES 2371534 T3 20120104; FR 2902111 A1 20071214; FR 2902111 B1 20090306; HR P20110850 T1 20111231; JP 2009540118 A 20091119; KR 20090023475 A 20090304; MX 2008015740 A 20090302; PL 2027300 T3 20120131; UA 97368 C2 20120210; US 2010307430 A1 20101209; US 9005520 B2 20150414

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-10 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2017-08-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 520796 T

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-05-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-05-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20161231

2016-12-31 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602007016606

2016-12-31 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 602007016606

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-29 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20160606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-07-31 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070607

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120607

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2013-12-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-10-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-07-31 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2013-06-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111117

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: V & M FRANCE

- Effective date: 20120630

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOUIS, GHISLAIN

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, ADELINE

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, EMILIE

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEPINGLE, VIVIANE

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VANDENBERGHE BRUNO

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEYER JEAN

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT DANIEL (DECEDE)

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOUQUET, ANNIE

2012-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, CATHELINE

2012-08-09 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 602007016606

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-04-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-03-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111118

2012-02-29 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-02-29 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-01-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-01-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110817

2012-01-04 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2371534 T3

- Effective date: 20120104

2011-12-07 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110817

2011-12-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-11-04 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2011-10-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007016606

- Effective date: 20111027

2011-09-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2011-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: HR

2011-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOUQUET, ANNIE

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, CATHELINE

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, EMILIE

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PETELOT, ADELINE

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEPINGLE, VIVIANE

2011-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOUIS, GHISLAIN

2011-07-06 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20081118

- Countries: HR

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS