Global Patent Index - EP 2027315 A1

EP 2027315 A1 2009-02-25 - COMBING MACHINE WITH A RESERVE REEL TROUGH

Title (en)

COMBING MACHINE WITH A RESERVE REEL TROUGH

Title (de)

KÄMMMASCHINE MIT RESERVEWICKELMULDE

Title (fr)

PEIGNEUSE AVEC AUGE À BOBINES DE RÉSERVE

Publication

EP 2027315 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725359 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004451 W
  • DE 102006024555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134805A1] In order to relieve the operator of a combing machine from having to handle the heavy comb reels (4, 7), a mechanically operated reserve reel trough (6) is provided. It can be lowered to such a level that it can easily roll comb reels, even from the lowest position into which they are delivered by the combing machine, into the reserve reel trough. On the other hand it can be raised to such a high level that the reserve reels roll by themselves into working position on the reel cylinders (2, 3). The mechanical operation is effected preferably by a fluidically (pneumatic or hydraulic) operable work element with cylinder and piston which is arranged between the frame of the combing machine and the reserve reel trough.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134805A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134805 A1 20071129; CN 101448985 A 20090603; CN 101448985 B 20101215; DE 102006024555 A1 20071206; DE 102006024555 B4 20120405; DE 502007005900 D1 20110120; EP 2027315 A1 20090225; EP 2027315 B1 20101208; JP 2009537424 A 20091029

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ZHUOLANG TEXTILE MACHINERY CO. LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZHUOLANG TEXTILE MACHINERY CO. LTD., JINTAN, CN

- Document: DE 502007005900

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20101208

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20101208

2014-01-23 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 502007005900

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-01-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ZHUOLANG TEXTILE MACHINERY CO. LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 502007005900

- Effective date: 20131122

2013-12-04 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20130312

2013-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101208

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2013-03-12 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 502007005900

2013-03-12 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 502007005900

2011-12-08 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007005900

- Effective date: 20110908

2011-10-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20110908

2011-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007005900 P 20110120

2010-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI TR

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHEUFLER, MATHIAS

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLEUREN, HEINER

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS