Global Patent Index - EP 2027318 A1

EP 2027318 A1 2009-02-25 - POSITIVE FEEDWHEEL SYSTEM WITH MOVABLE THREAD EYE

Title (en)

POSITIVE FEEDWHEEL SYSTEM WITH MOVABLE THREAD EYE

Title (de)

POSITIVFOURNISSEUR MIT BEWEGLICHER EINLAUFÖSE

Title (fr)

BOBINE DÉBITRICE POSITIVE AVEC GUIDE-FIL MOBILE

Publication

EP 2027318 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06743092 A

Priority

EP 2006005189 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144007A1] The thread delivery device (5) according to the invention has a thread eye which serves as a broken thread sensor. This is made possible in that the thread eye is movably mounted, performing the function which consists of guiding the thread (15) in a controlled fashion to the thread intake area (16) from all of the positions that the thread sensor can assume. Preferably, the thread guiding thread eye is the only element between the thread brake and the thread feed wheel that touches the thread. The thread guiding thread eye is positioned to be accessible at the front side of the thread delivery device. The thread can be mounted with one hand.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144007A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144007 A1 20071221; WO 2007144007 A8 20090115; WO 2007144007 A9 20090305; CN 101448988 A 20090603; CN 101448988 B 20130501; EP 2027318 A1 20090225; EP 2027318 B1 20130213; TW 200743689 A 20071201; TW I337633 B 20110221

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170607

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006012497

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131114

2013-04-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006012497

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT TR

2009-07-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE IT TR

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090422

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAUFMANN, RICHARD

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIXNER, MICHAEL

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS