Global Patent Index - EP 2027340 A1

EP 2027340 A1 2009-02-25 - FLOOR PROVIDED WITH STRUCTURAL JOINT

Title (en)

FLOOR PROVIDED WITH STRUCTURAL JOINT

Title (de)

BODENBELAG MIT AUSDEHNUNGSFUGE

Title (fr)

SOL EN BETON AVEC JOINT STRUCTURAL

Publication

EP 2027340 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06754306 A

Priority

EP 2006005618 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144008A1] A structural joint adapted to be engaged with slabs made of a moldable material comprising at least two profile elements, each adapted to be integral with one of the edges of two adjacent slabs, each profile having a substantial vertical stem adapted for extending at least partly along the edges up to a sharp edge of an upper surface of the slab, whereby that the top edge of each vertical stem of the profile elements of two adjacent slabs as seen along the line between the two adjacent slabs is composed of non- linear elements.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/14 (2006.01); E01C 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/14 (2013.01); E01C 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144008 A1 20071221; DK 2027340 T3 20150622; EP 2027340 A1 20090225; EP 2027340 B1 20150513; EP 2027340 B8 20150715; EP 2930269 A1 20151014; ES 2538711 T3 20150623; HU E026016 T2 20160530; PT 2027340 E 20150709; SI 2027340 T1 20150831

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-29 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20170612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150513

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-30 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E026016

2016-03-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PEIKKO GROUP CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20160211

2016-03-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HSD INDUSTRIEBELAEGE GMBH

- Effective date: 20160204

2016-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150513

2016-02-15 [REG AT UEP] PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: AT 726900 T

- Effective date: 20150513

2016-02-04 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 602006045428

2015-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150913

2015-09-03 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20150401278

- Effective date: 20150720

2015-09-03 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 18806

2015-08-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2015-08-17 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E010702

- Effective date: 20150615

2015-07-09 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20150603

2015-07-01 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2015-06-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602006045428

- Effective date: 20150625

2015-06-23 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2538711 T3

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-06-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2015-06-22 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20150619

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-06-16 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2015-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 726900 T

- Effective date: 20150615

2015-06-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2015-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-05-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-04-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150325

2015-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENGELHOEF CONCRETE JOINTS MANUFACTURING NV

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-01-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111227

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS