Global Patent Index - EP 2027345 A1

EP 2027345 A1 2009-02-25 - COMPLEX EDIFICE WITH CULTURAL, ADMINISTRATIVE, POLITICAL AND/OR MILITARY CHARACTER

Title (en)

COMPLEX EDIFICE WITH CULTURAL, ADMINISTRATIVE, POLITICAL AND/OR MILITARY CHARACTER

Title (de)

KOMPLEXES GEBÄUDE MIT KULTURELLEM, ADMINISTRATIVEM, POLITISCHEM UND/ODER MILITÄRISCHEM CHARAKTER

Title (fr)

EDIFICE COMPLEXE A CARACTERE CULTUREL, ADMINISTRATIF, POLITIQUE ET/OU MILITAIRE

Publication

EP 2027345 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05851069 A

Priority

RO 2005000018 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007061327A1] The invention relates to an edifice destined to simultaneously carrying on more main complex national or international activities that are similar, related or completely independent and having cultural, administrative, political an/or military character, depending on the requirements imposed permanently or only at a given menent. The edifice consists of an assembly of buildings independent as foundation and strength structure, but unitary from an architectonic viewpoint (Al, Al, A3, Bl, B2, B3, B4, Cl, C2, C3 etc.) arranged so as to have, in assembly, a square, rectangular, octangular, hexagonal, circular, oval shape, etc, but which allows it to be symmetrical relative to at least one median line, preferable transverse line (AP), perpendicular to the main face of the building and possibly to the longitudinal line (TT), the two axes being, in their turn, perpendicular to each other.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/34 (2006.01); E04H 1/04 (2006.01); E04H 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/06 (2013.01); E04B 2001/0053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007061327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007061327 A1 20070531; DE 602005023080 D1 20100930; EP 2027345 A1 20090225; EP 2027345 B1 20100818

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-11-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20160711

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-08-12 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Effective date: 20160711

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SMARANDA MARCULET-PETRESCU, DE

- Effective date: 20160415

2016-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARCULET-PETRESCU, ANCA GEORGIANA CRISTINA, RO

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MARCULET PETRESCU, MIRA ANCA VICTORIA, BUCARESTI 4, RO

- Document: DE 602005023080

2016-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARCULET-PETRESCU, SMARANDA ANA MARIA, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MARCULET PETRESCU, MIRA ANCA VICTORIA, BUCARESTI 4, RO

- Document: DE 602005023080

2016-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARCULET-PETRESCU, GEORGE HONORIUS, RO

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MARCULET PETRESCU, MIRA ANCA VICTORIA, BUCARESTI 4, RO

- Document: DE 602005023080

2016-04-08 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Effective date: 20160308

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2012-02-22 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Free text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20120130

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101128

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005023080

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-08-24 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Free text: APPLICATION FILED

2011-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101128

2010-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005023080 P 20100930

2010-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-05-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091102

2009-07-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU