Global Patent Index - EP 2027346 A1

EP 2027346 A1 2009-02-25 - SLAB TIE FOR CONCRETE FORMING SYSTEM

Title (en)

SLAB TIE FOR CONCRETE FORMING SYSTEM

Title (de)

PLATTENANKER FÜR BETONFORMSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ATTACHE DE DALLE POUR SYSTÈME DE FORMAGE DE BÉTON

Publication

EP 2027346 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06761049 A

Priority

CA 2006000961 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140570A1] A connector (10) and a bracket (60) support a panel (80) interlocked with another panel where a horizontal slab will join a wall formed between the panels. The connector has a bar interconnecting opposed parallel, vertical planar members. A protrusion (46) is formed on an outward face of one planar member (16). One portion (48) of the protrusion extends outwardly away from the member's outward face. Another portion (50) of the protrusion is spaced outwardly from the member's outward face, and extends perpendicularly to the one portion, parallel to the member's outward face. The bracket has two perpendicularly intersecting portions (62, 64), with a vertical slot (68) formed through the lower edge of one portion. The bracket's other portion is fastened to a board (60) which is positioned to slidably engage the slot over the protrusion when connector engages the panel, supporting the board against the panel's outward face.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/161 (2013.01); E04B 2/8652 (2013.01); E04B 2002/8688 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140570 A1 20071213; AU 2006344330 A1 20071213; AU 2006344330 B2 20110407; EP 2027346 A1 20090225; EP 2027346 A4 20140115; ZA 200809058 B 20100127

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140722

2014-01-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20131212

2014-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 2/86 20060101AFI20131206BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS