Global Patent Index - EP 2027351 A1

EP 2027351 A1 2009-02-25 - ROOF WINDOW FRAME WITH A WATER DRAINING CHANNEL

Title (en)

ROOF WINDOW FRAME WITH A WATER DRAINING CHANNEL

Title (de)

DACHFENSTERRAHMEN MIT WASSERABFLUSSKANAL

Title (fr)

CHÂSSIS DE FENÊTRE DE TOIT AVEC RAINURE D'ÉVACUATION D'EAU

Publication

EP 2027351 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07747731 A

Priority

  • PL 2007000021 W
  • PL 37950806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007123430A1] The window frame according the invention consists of longitudinal elements connected to form a frame, usually a rectangular one. Along the whole inner circumference, or along the lower half of the inner circumference, the window frame is provided with flat faying surfaces (4), which are arranged on one plane, below the external, upper surface of the window frame. The faying surfaces (4) of the window frame mate with the corresponding faying surfaces of the window leaf frame and the gasket located between them. In the bottom element (2) of the window frame, advantageously on the extension of the side faying surfaces (4), there are transversal through channels (6) with an inlet opening arranged on the plane of the inner side wall and an outlet opening fitted with a throating (8), which protrudes out of the external side wall of the element (2). The outlet opening with the throating (8) is located above the upper surface of the rafter, so that the drained water flows out on the initial roofing foil.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/031 (2013.01); E06B 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007123430A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007123430 A1 20071101; EP 2027351 A1 20090225; EP 2027351 B1 20120919; PL 211524 B1 20120531; PL 379508 A1 20071029

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-10-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007025574

- Effective date: 20130620

2013-08-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130620

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121230

2012-11-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007025574

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2012-09-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-06-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS