Global Patent Index - EP 2027368 A1

EP 2027368 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS TURBINE ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS TURBINE ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER FLUGGASTURBINE

Title (fr)

FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE TURBINE À GAZ D'AVION

Publication

EP 2027368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06753264 A

Priority

DE 2006000996 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140730A1] The invention relates to a gas turbine, in particular to an aircraft engine, having at least one compressor, a combustion chamber and at least one turbine, wherein at least one generator for generating electrical energy is assigned to at least one turbine. According to the invention, after the shutdown of the gas turbine, the or each generator can be used as a motor in order to drive a rotor of the respective turbine for a certain period after the shutdown of the gas turbine and in this way effect uniform cooling of the rotor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/36 (2013.01); F01D 21/06 (2013.01); F01D 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140730A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140730 A1 20071213; DE 112006003994 A5 20090520; EP 2027368 A1 20090225; EP 2027368 B1 20100106; EP 2027368 B9 20120118; US 2009301053 A1 20091210; US 9121309 B2 20150901

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-12-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131114 AND 20131120

2010-12-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101007

2010-02-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2010-01-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2009-09-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF OPERATING A GAS TURBINE ENGINE

2009-07-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090318

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS