Global Patent Index - EP 2027381 A2

EP 2027381 A2 2009-02-25 - MULTI-PART COOLED PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

MULTI-PART COOLED PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

MEHRTEILIGER GEKÜHLTER KOLBEN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

PISTON EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES, REFROIDI, POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 2027381 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07785519 A

Priority

  • DE 2007001015 W
  • DE 102006027354 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007143969A2] Proposed is a multi-part cooled piston (1) for an internal combustion engine, which piston (1) is composed of an upper piston part (2) and a lower piston part (6). The upper piston part (2) forms an inner annular cooling duct (11) with the lower piston part (6), which cooling duct (11) is covered by an upper region (31) of the lower piston part (6). Said region (31) is of thin-walled design in such a way that it can be deformed in the manner of a plate spring. Simple and fast assembly of the upper piston part (2) on the lower piston part (6), and a fixed and secure screw connection between the two piston parts, result in that the upper piston part (2) is provided on its underside with a blind bore (26) which is arranged centrally and coaxially with respect to the piston axis (25) and has an internal thread (28), and in that the upper region (31) of the lower piston part (6) has a threaded bolt (29) which is arranged centrally and coaxially with respect to the piston axis (25), points upward and has an external thread (30), with the internal thread (28) matching the external thread (30), such that the upper piston part (2) can be screwed to the lower piston part (6) by means of the blind bore (26) and the threaded bolt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/0023 (2013.01); F02F 3/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007143969A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027354 A1 20071220; CN 101466937 A 20090624; CN 101466937 B 20110706; DE 502007004798 D1 20100930; EP 2027381 A2 20090225; EP 2027381 B1 20100818; JP 2009540201 A 20091119; KR 20090018628 A 20090220; US 2011155080 A1 20110630; US 8201537 B2 20120619; WO 2007143969 A2 20071221; WO 2007143969 A3 20080228

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150608

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150608

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502007004798

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140701

- Year of fee payment: 8

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007004798

- Effective date: 20110519

2011-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110519

2010-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007004798 P 20100930

2010-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090902

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS