Global Patent Index - EP 2027423 A2

EP 2027423 A2 2009-02-25 - PROCESS FOR LIQUEFYING HYDROGEN

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR LIQUEFYING HYDROGEN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERFLÜSSIGEN VON WASSERSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE LIQUÉFACTION D'HYDROGÈNE

Publication

EP 2027423 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725781 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004902 W
  • DE 102006027199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2655037A1] The invention relates to a process for liquefying hydrogen. To reduce the specific energy consumption, the following process steps are used: a) the p recooling of the hydrogen stream by indirect heat exchange against a pressur ized LNG stream to a temperature of between 140 and 130 K, b) the precooling of the hydrogen stream by indirect heat exchange against a coolant to a tem perature of between 85 and 75 K, c) where the precooling of the coolant take s place against a pressurized LNG stream, and d) the cooling and at least pa rtial liquefaction of the precooled hydrogen stream takes place by indirect heat exchange against another hydrogen stream channeled through a closed coo ling circuit, e) where the precooling of the condensed hydrogen stream, whic h is channeled through a closed cooling circuit, takes place against a press urized LNG stream.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/001 (2013.01); F25J 1/0052 (2013.01); F25J 1/0067 (2013.01); F25J 1/0072 (2013.01); F25J 1/0205 (2013.01); F25J 1/0221 (2013.01); F25J 1/0265 (2013.01); F25J 1/0268 (2013.01); F25J 2210/62 (2013.01); F25J 2240/60 (2013.01); F25J 2245/90 (2013.01); F25J 2270/904 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144078A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027199 A1 20071213; CA 2655037 A1 20071221; CN 101466990 A 20090624; EP 2027423 A2 20090225; JP 2009540259 A 20091119; KR 20090016515 A 20090213; RU 2009100154 A 20100720; US 2010083695 A1 20100408; WO 2007144078 A2 20071221; WO 2007144078 A3 20080117

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110315

2010-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101104

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS