Global Patent Index - EP 2027430 A1

EP 2027430 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE THICKNESS OF AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COATING ON AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE THICKNESS OF AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COATING ON AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER SCHICHTDICKE EINER ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN BESCHICHTUNG AUF EINEM ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN SUBSTRAT

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉPAISSEUR D'UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT ÉLECTRO-CONDUCTEUR SUR UN SUBSTRAT ÉLECTRO-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 2027430 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729503 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055074 W
  • DE 102006025356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137997A1] The invention relates to a method for determining the layer thickness of an electrically conductive coating (52) which is applied on an electrically conductive substrate (50) of a test object. First, the induced voltage (U (air, ?)) of an eddy current sensor is collected in the air as a function of the frequency (?) of an exciter field. The majority of coated reference objects which have been provided each contains a substrate and coating from the same materials, such as the substrate (50) and coating (52) of the test object. The reference objects display various known layer thicknesses. A reference voltage (U(x,?)) can be detected for each reference object as a function of the frequency (?) of the exciter field with the eddy current sensor. Subsequently, a material induced voltage (U<SUB>mat</SUB>(x)) can be determined from the reference voltage (U(x,?)) and the induced voltage (U(air, ?)) of the eddy current sensor in the air for each reference object. Afterwards, standard amplitude of the material induced voltage (U<SUB>mat</SUB>(x)) can be generated for each reference object. Thus, a calibration curve results, which represents the standard amplitude of the material induced voltage (U<SUB>mat</SUB>(x)) as a function of layer thickness (d<SUB>1</SUB>) of the coating (52). The standard amplitude is also determined in the same way for test objects. Thus, the layer thickness (d<SUB>1</SUB>) of the coating (52) of the test object is determined by the calibration curve.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137997A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025356 A1 20071206; CN 101460808 A 20090617; EP 2027430 A1 20090225; JP 2009539086 A 20091112; RU 2008152770 A 20100710; US 2009251137 A1 20091008; WO 2007137997 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100220

2009-11-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-10-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE THICKNESS OF AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE COATING ON AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090512

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS