Global Patent Index - EP 2027435 A1

EP 2027435 A1 2009-02-25 - MASS-SENSITIVE THIN-FILM RESONATORS FOR LAYER THICKNESS MEASURING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

MASS-SENSITIVE THIN-FILM RESONATORS FOR LAYER THICKNESS MEASURING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

MASSENSENSITIVE DÜNNSCHICHTRESONATOREN FÜR SCHICHTDICKENMASSSYSTEME

Title (fr)

RÉSONATEURS À COUCHES MINCES SENSIBLES À LA MASSE POUR DES SYSTÈMES DE MESURE D'ÉPAISSEUR DE COUCHE

Publication

EP 2027435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725761 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004881 W
  • DE 102006026308 A
  • DE 102006054348 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140943A1] The present invention relates to a layer thickness sensor for monitoring deposition processes and to a method for monitoring layer deposition processes in microsystem technology and nanotechnology. In order to provide an improved sensor which makes it possible to determine layer thicknesses in the region of less than approximately 0.2 nm, the invention proposes using mass-sensitive, piezoelectric thin-film resonators which are polarized both longitudinally and transversally for such layer thickness measuring systems. Temperature compensation can be additionally carried out by exciting at least two different oscillation modes at different frequencies and with a different temperature response and by means of corresponding calculation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/06 (2006.01); H03H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/02102 (2013.01); G01B 7/066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140943A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006054348 A1 20071206; DE 102006054348 B4 20130404; EP 2027435 A1 20090225; WO 2007140943 A1 20071213; WO 2007140943 A8 20080515

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140624

2014-03-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-02-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H03H 9/02 20060101ALI20140114BHEP

2014-02-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01B 7/06 20060101AFI20140114BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOSCHONSKY, MARC

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DADGAR, ARMIN

2009-05-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REINDL, LEONHARD

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081217

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS