Global Patent Index - EP 2027445 A2

EP 2027445 A2 2009-02-25 - DEVICE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFICATION OF TEMPERATURE OVER TIME

Title (en)

DEVICE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFICATION OF TEMPERATURE OVER TIME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERIFIKATION VON TEMPERATUR ALS FUNKTION DER ZEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF, SYSTEME ET METHODE DE VERIFICATION D'UN CAPITAL THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 2027445 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 06820885 A

Priority

  • IB 2006003201 W
  • FR 0601259 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007093845A2] The invention relates to a method for control of storage temperature over time for storage of a perishable product, comprising determination of an initial storage temperature over time (CTCi) equal to 100% as a function of the total valid life span for a product in days, division of the temperature range for storage of the product into a normal operation zone and at least one abnormal operation zone and an incremental reduction by a certain value, optionally zero, of the initial storage temperature over time (CTCi), with each calculation step for each operation zone corresponding to the temperature measured by a temperature probe.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01K 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01K 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007093845A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2897427 A1 20070817; EP 2027445 A2 20090225; WO 2007093845 A2 20070823; WO 2007093845 A3 20090326

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090720

2009-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01K 3/04 20060101AFI20090507BHEP

2009-04-29 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080912

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR