Global Patent Index - EP 2027450 A1

EP 2027450 A1 2009-02-25 - OPTICAL COMPONENT OPERATING IN NEAR FIELD TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

OPTICAL COMPONENT OPERATING IN NEAR FIELD TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

BEI DER NAHFELDTRANSMISSION ARBEITENDE OPTISCHE KOMPONENTE

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT OPTIQUE FONCTIONNANT EN TRANSMISSION EN CHAMP PROCHE

Publication

EP 2027450 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07730020 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055665 W
  • FR 0652095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144313A1] The invention consists of an optical component for detection in near field operating in transmission. It includes at least a part (11b) forming at least a network (11) of diffraction microstructures (11a) succeeding each other over a plurality of periods (p), with this network (11) being capable of converting evanescent waves (16) which occur between the component and an object (12) located in near field when it reflects or emits radiation with a wavelength in propagating waves (16') through the diffraction effect in transmission through the part (11b) forming the (11) diffraction microstructures (11a) network (11). The network (11) period (p) is on the order of magnitude of the radiation wavelength. Suitable for use with detection devices in near field.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01Q 10/00 (2010.01); G01Q 60/22 (2010.01); G01Q 80/00 (2010.01); G11B 7/135 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01Q 60/22 (2013.01); G11B 7/1353 (2013.01); G11B 7/1381 (2013.01); G11B 7/1387 (2013.01); G01Q 80/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2902226 A1 20071214; FR 2902226 B1 20100129; CN 101467021 A 20090624; EP 2027450 A1 20090225; JP 2009540312 A 20091119; KR 20090027195 A 20090316; US 2009205090 A1 20090813; US 8030604 B2 20111004; WO 2007144313 A1 20071221

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160105

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MIMOUNI, SALIM

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: POUPINET, LUDOVIC

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS