Global Patent Index - EP 2027454 A1

EP 2027454 A1 2009-02-25 - APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PARTICULAR PROPERTIES OF A POURABLE MATERIAL

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING PARTICULAR PROPERTIES OF A POURABLE MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG BESTIMMTER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES SCHÜTTFÄHIGEN GUTS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PROPRIÉTÉS DÉFINIES D'UN PRODUIT COULANT

Publication

EP 2027454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07723599 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002653 W
  • DE 102006022894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131571A1] An apparatus (10) for determining particular properties of a pourable material (3), which flows out of a container (5) onto an essentially flat plate (6) and accumulates on the plate (6) in the form of a cone (3a), has at least one optical conductor (12) which is fitted to a holding device (11) and has at least one illumination fibre (13) and at least one detection fibre (14). The illumination fibre (13) sends optical radiation to the pourable material (3). The detection fibre (14) is arranged in such a manner that it receives optical radiation reflected by the pourable material (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 11/00 (2013.01); G01B 11/00 (2013.01); G01N 21/01 (2013.01); G01N 2001/1006 (2013.01); G01N 2033/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022894 A1 20071122; EP 2027454 A1 20090225; WO 2007131571 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151001

2014-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMA TEST APPARATEBAU GMBH

2014-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J & M ANALYTIK AG

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS