Global Patent Index - EP 2027457 A1

EP 2027457 A1 2009-02-25 - DEVICE FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE TESTING OF A COMPONENT BY ANALYZING RADIATION DISSIPATION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE TESTING OF A COMPONENT BY ANALYZING RADIATION DISSIPATION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM NICHTDESTRUKTIVEN TESTEN EINER KOMPONENTE DURCH ANALYSIEREN VON STRAHLUNGSDISSIPATION

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF D'UNE PIÈCE PAR ANALYSE DE DISSIPATION DE RAYONNEMENT

Publication

EP 2027457 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07729210 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054762 W
  • FR 0651902 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135059A1] The invention concerns a device for non-destructive testing of a component (4) by analyzing radiation dissipation when the component is stressed by mechanical stresses. Said device comprises measuring means for determining a surface radiation field of the component. The measuring means are integrated in a flexible housing (2) for covering a region of the surface of the component (4) to be tested. Said device enable an initial crack upon stress concentration on a surface of the component and the presence of a crack (5) upon propagation of said crack to be detected. The invention is useful for non-destructive testing of aircraft components, but may be used in all industrial sectors where testing the integrity of components is important, such as the automotive, railway, marine and nuclear industries.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 25/72 (2006.01); G01K 1/14 (2006.01); G01K 7/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/88 (2006.01); H01L 27/146 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 25/72 (2013.01); H01L 27/14893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135059 A1 20071129; BR PI0712211 A2 20120313; CA 2651392 A1 20071129; CN 101449153 A 20090603; CN 101449153 B 20120711; EP 2027457 A1 20090225; FR 2901609 A1 20071130; FR 2901609 B1 20090116; JP 2009537836 A 20091029; JP 5187695 B2 20130424; RU 2008151170 A 20100627; RU 2439545 C2 20120110; US 2010011861 A1 20100121; US 8173964 B2 20120508

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151105

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100528

2010-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS