Global Patent Index - EP 2027473 A1

EP 2027473 A1 2009-02-25 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE VELOCITY OF A MOVING OBJECT

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE VELOCITY OF A MOVING OBJECT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES BEWEGLICHEN OBJEKTS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR MESURER LA VITESSE D'UN OBJET MOBILE

Publication

EP 2027473 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06776052 A

Priority

EP 2006005723 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007144013A1] The invention relates to a method and a system for measuring the velocity of a moving object. The method comprises: acquiring from a first sensor first data associated to the passage of the moving object in the sensitivity field of the first sensor and representative of a physical quantity variable with the object passage; calculating from the first data a time variation of the physical quantity; acquiring from a second sensor spaced from the first sensor by a known distance second data associated to the passage of the moving object in the sensitivity field of the second sensor and representative of the physical quantity; calculating from the first and second data a first and a second numerical quantity representative respectively of a time derivative and a spatial derivative of the physical quantity in a given time interval; and calculating the velocity of the moving object in the given time interval as a function of the first and second numerical quantity; wherein the method comprises the step of comparing the time variation of the physical quantity with a first threshold value and at least the step of calculating the velocity is conditional upon being the time variation of the physical quantity in the given time interval above the first threshold value. A system based on the above method is also disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01P 3/66 (2006.01); G01P 3/64 (2006.01); G08G 1/02 (2006.01); G08G 1/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/052 (2013.01); G01P 3/64 (2013.01); G01P 3/66 (2013.01); G08G 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007144013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007144013 A1 20071221; EP 2027473 A1 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120910

2012-05-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-09-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110823

2010-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIRELLI & C. S.P.A.

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS